EP1314563 - Ink-jet head, and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/29] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokunaga, Hiroyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/22] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026253.1 | 26.11.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | JP20010361072 | 27.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001361072 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1314563 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1314563 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | [2003/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1314563 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14, B41J2/16 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
B41J2/1642 (EP,US);
B41J2/00 (KR);
B41J2/14129 (EP,US);
B41J2/1603 (EP,US);
B41J2/1628 (EP,US);
B41J2/1629 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1637 (EP,US);
B41J2/1639 (EP,US);
B41J2/1646 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/22] | Title | German: | Tintenstrahlkopf und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2003/22] | English: | Ink-jet head, and method for manufacturing the same | [2003/22] | French: | Tête à jet d'encre et sa méthode de fabrication | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.07.2009 | BE | 15.07.2009 | CY | 15.07.2009 | CZ | 15.07.2009 | DK | 15.07.2009 | EE | 15.07.2009 | FI | 15.07.2009 | IT | 15.07.2009 | NL | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | SK | 15.07.2009 | TR | 15.07.2009 | BG | 15.10.2009 | GR | 16.10.2009 | ES | 26.10.2009 | PT | 15.11.2009 | GB | 26.11.2009 | IE | 26.11.2009 | LU | 26.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
GB | 26.11.2009 | ||
IE | 26.11.2009 | ||
LU | 26.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
GB | 26.11.2009 | ||
IE | 26.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
GB | 26.11.2009 | ||
IE | 26.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 26.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
IE | 26.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
BE | 15.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 15.07.2009 | |
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1108549 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 1,15,19 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] * * figures 9-17 *; | [A]EP1090761 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,15,19 * paragraph [0048] * * figures 4A-4F *; | [A]JPH05261932 (SEIKOSHA CO LTD) [A] 1,15,19 * figures 2-5 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] *; | [PA]JP2002326360 (CANON KK) [PA] 1,15,19 * figure 8 *; | [PA]JP2002046283 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [PA] 1,15,19 * paragraph [0037] * | by applicant | JPH0410940 | JPS6449662 | JPH06246946 | JPH05279114 |