EP1319815 - Cooling circuit of a liquid cooled internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2003/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeffinger, Harald Mörikestrasse 7 75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | 02 /
Sass, Heiko Lindenstrasse 93 71732 Tamm / DE | [2003/25] | Application number, filing date | 02026570.8 | 28.11.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | DE2001161851 | 15.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10161851 | [2003/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1319815 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1319815 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16, F01P3/20 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
F16H57/0412 (EP,US);
F01P3/20 (EP,US);
F01P7/16 (EP,US);
F02M26/28 (EP,US);
F16H57/0413 (EP,US);
F01P2005/105 (EP,US);
F01P2005/125 (EP,US);
F01P2007/146 (EP,US);
F01P2025/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/42] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühlkreislauf einer flüssigkeitsgekühlten Brennkraftmaschine | [2003/25] | English: | Cooling circuit of a liquid cooled internal combustion engine | [2003/25] | French: | Circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne refroidi par liquide | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 03.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3403435 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1-4,6 * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 6; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0736703 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US3315464 (HAYDEN PEREZ M) [A] 1-3,6,7 * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 75; figures 7-9 *; | [A]US3752222 (OLBERMANN J) [A] 1-3,6 * column 2, line 6 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [A]DE905459 (FRANZ KRUCKENBERG DIPL ING, et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 17 - line 114; figure 6 * |