EP1316496 - Method and device for fastening convergent walls of prefabricated structures, as well as profiled sections which can be fixed at the edges of such walls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manzi, Paolo Via Romana Lucchese, 35, Loc. Ponte a Cappiano 50050 Fucecchio (FI) / IT | [2003/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giaconi, Enrico Via S. Sebastiano, 25 56021 Cascina PI / IT | [2003/24] |
Former [2003/23] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | Celestino, Marco ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 02026579.9 | 28.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | IT2001PI00077 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: IT PI20010077 | [2003/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1316496 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1316496 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/04 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
B62D33/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/20] |
Former [2003/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Befestigung von konvergierenden Wänden von vorgefertigten Strukturen und Verbundprofilen, die an die Kantleisten von solchen Wänden befestigt werden können | [2003/23] | English: | Method and device for fastening convergent walls of prefabricated structures, as well as profiled sections which can be fixed at the edges of such walls | [2003/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de connection de panneaux convergents de structures préfabriquées, et sections profilées qui peuvent être fixées aux bords de ces panneaux | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/48] | 27.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.04.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.04.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.04.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4572694 (HOEKSEMA ARI H [CA]) [A] 1,2,4,9,12 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE19539862 (EKONAL BAUSYSTEME GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,9,12 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5647682 (RIEHM THOMAS [CH]) [A] 1,9,12 * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-3 * |