EP1316364 - Internal impingement nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Bradley P. 1931 Estabrook Way Superior, Colorado 80027 / US | [2003/23] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/23] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg), Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026638.3 | 29.11.2002 | [2003/23] | Priority number, date | US20010338611P | 03.12.2001 Original published format: US 338611 P | US20020176194 | 20.06.2002 Original published format: US 176194 | US20020288473 | 06.11.2002 Original published format: US 288473 | [2003/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1316364 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/26 | [2003/23] | CPC: |
B05B1/042 (EP,US);
B05B1/26 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Düse mit zusammenprallenden Strahlverlauf | [2003/23] | English: | Internal impingement nozzle | [2003/23] | French: | Buse avec des jets qui se téléscopent | [2003/23] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4141507 (RUMP MARTIN) [X] 1-4,10-12,17-20 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5524660 (DUGAN JEFFREY S [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,20 * figure 1 *; | [X]FR2766108 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]) [X] 1-3,20 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0427386 (GEN DYNAMICS CORP) [X] 1-3 * figure 2 *; | [X]GB2296671 (LANCASHIRE ENVIRONMENTAL SERVI [GB]) [X] 1,20 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5067655 (FARAGO ZOLTAN [DE], et al) [A] 21-24 * figure 3 * |