EP1321751 - Method and circuit for the determination of the electrical resistance of a PTC-heating element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beru AG Mörikestrasse 155 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, Jürgen Sterntalerstrasse 18 76297 Stutensee-Büchig / DE | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut, et al Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | Kilian, Helmut, et al Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | Pohlmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Phys. WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026675.5 | 29.11.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | DE2001162254 | 18.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162254 | [2003/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1321751 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1321751 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01K7/20, G01K7/24, H05B1/02 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H05B1/0288 (EP);
G01K7/206 (EP);
G01K7/24 (EP);
H05B2203/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Schaltungsanordnung zum Bestimmen des elektrischen Widerstandes eines PTC-Heizelementes | [2003/26] | English: | Method and circuit for the determination of the electrical resistance of a PTC-heating element | [2003/26] | French: | Méthode et circuit pour la détermination de la résistance électrique d'un élément de chauffage de PTC | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 07.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.04.2007 | CZ | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | EE | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | IE | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | SK | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | BG | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | LU | 29.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | CH | 30.11.2007 | LI | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
LU | 29.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.11.2007 | ||
LI | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | CZ | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 18.04.2007 | |
PT | 18.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2757334 (BEURER GMBH & CO) [X] 1-3 * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 6; figure 2; claims 1-5 * [Y] 4; | [Y]DE3818974 (RUTHENBERG GMBH WAERMETECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 1, line 59, paragraph 67 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 8 ** figure 1 * |