EP1424343 - Peptide Conjugate useful for cell nucleus molecular imaging and tumor therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Deutsches Krebsforschungszentrum Stiftung des öffentlichen Rechts Im Neuenheimer Feld 280 69120 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heckl, Stefan Steubenstr. 28 69120 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Braun, Dr. Klaus Bruchhausen 1B 69207 Sandhausen / DE | 03 /
Pipkorn, Dr. Rüdiger Adolf-Rauch-Str. 3 69124 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
Waldeck, Waldemar Dr. Tilsiter Str. 49 69514 Laudenbach / DE | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Schüssler, Andrea Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/23] | Schüssler, Andrea, Dr. Kanzlei Huber & Schüssler Truderinger Strasse 246 81825 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026700.1 | 29.11.2002 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424343 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, A61K49/14, A61K47/48, A61P35/00 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
C12N15/62 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61K49/085 (EP,US);
A61K49/14 (EP,US);
A61K51/088 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K19/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/09 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/08] |
Former [2004/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Peptidkonjugat zur molekularen Zellkernabbildung oder Tumorbehandlung | [2004/23] | English: | Peptide Conjugate useful for cell nucleus molecular imaging and tumor therapy | [2004/23] | French: | Conjugué peptidique pour l'imagerie moléculaire des noyeux cellulaires et la thérapie des tumeurs | [2004/23] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/37] | 05.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9534295 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) [Y] 1-3,5-16 * page 6, second paragraph; page 11, first paragraph; claims 11-15 *; | [Y] - HEIJNE VON G ET AL, "SPECIES-SPECIFIC VARIATION IN SIGNAL PEPTIDE DESIGN IMPLICATIONS FOR PROTEIN SECRETION IN FOREIGN HOSTS", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (198902), vol. 244, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 439 - 446, XP001149430 [Y] 1-3,5-16 * page 439, left-hand column, second paragraph; page 439, right-hand column, last paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(89)80579-4 | [Y] - BRAUN K ET AL, "A biological transporter for the delivery of peptide nucleic acids (PNAs) to the nuclear compartment of living cells", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (2002), vol. 318, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 237 - 243, XP002238940 [Y] 5-10 * abstract; table 1; page 242, left-hand columns, lines 5-9 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(02)00031-1 | [Y] - BHORADE RAJEEV ET AL, "Macrocyclic chelators with paramagnetic cations are internalized into mammalian cells via a HIV-tat derived membrane translocation peptide.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (200005), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 301 - 305, XP002242549 [Y] 2,12-14 * abstract; page 301, right-hand column, lines 5-8; page 302, left-hand column, lines 1-4; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc990168d |