EP1319719 - Reversibly modified thermostable enzymes for DNA synthesis and amplification in vitro [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2008/28] |
Former [2007/16] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2003/25] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sobek, Harald, Dr. Birkenstrasse 29 82377 Penzberg / DE | 02 /
Greif, Michael Fleck 28 83661 Lenggries / DE | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Jung, Michael Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Jung, Michael, Dr. Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung 68298 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026712.6 | 30.11.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | EP20010128725 | 03.12.2001 Original published format: EP 01128725 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1319719 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1319719 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1319719 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N9/99 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6848 (EP,US);
C12N9/1252 (EP,US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12N9/99 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6848, C12Q2549/101, C12Q2521/319, C12Q2521/101 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686, C12Q2549/101, C12Q2521/319, C12Q2521/101 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/25] | Title | German: | Reversibel modifizierte thermostabile Enzyme für die in vitro-Synthese und -Amplifizierung von DNA | [2003/25] | English: | Reversibly modified thermostable enzymes for DNA synthesis and amplification in vitro | [2003/25] | French: | Enzymes thermostables modifiées réversiblement pour la synthèse et l'amplification d'ADN in vitro | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 26.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | CZ | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | EE | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | SK | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | BG | 18.07.2007 | SE | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | IE | 30.11.2007 | LU | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 30.11.2007 | ||
LU | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
IE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | BE | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 18.04.2007 | |
SE | 18.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US5338671 (SCALICE EDWARD R [US], et al) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5436149 (BARNES WAYNE M [US]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 11 * * example 6 * * claims 1-16 *; | [DY]US5773258 (BIRCH DAVID EDWARD [US], et al) [DY] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1088891 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0125483 (STRATAGENE INC [US]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1130118 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 2, line 24 - line 36 * * page 5, line 4 - line 25 * * page 5, line 56 - page 6, line 54 *; | [PY]US6410277 (BARNES WAYNE M [US]) [PY] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A] - KLENK ET AL, "Archaeoglobus fulgidus section 144 of 172 of the complete genome", EMBL NUCLEOTIDE SEQU, XP002130948 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - KLENK H-P ET AL, "The complete genome sequence of the hyperthermophilic, sulphate-reducing archaeon Archaeoglobus fulgidus", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19971127), vol. 390, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 364 - 370, XP002091622 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/37052 |