EP1424124 - Foamed membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/23] | Membrane and use thereof | ||
[2008/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Box 10101 220 10 Lund / SE | [2004/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause Bernd Im Gaiern 8 72379 Hechingen / DE | 02 /
Wessling Mattias Weldinkhorst 28 7531 Enschede / NL | 03 /
Göhl Hermann Rosengarten 2 72406 Bisingen / DE | 04 /
Storr Markus Hinterhofstrasse 41/1 70771 L-Echterdingen / DE | [2004/23] | Representative(s) | Weber, Roland, et al WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Weber, Roland, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Patentanwälte Postfach 6145 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2004/23] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02026720.9 | 30.11.2002 | [2004/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1424124 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1424124 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D67/00 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
B01D67/002 (EP,US);
B01D67/00 (KR);
B01D67/0083 (EP,US);
B01D69/02 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | Geschäumte Membran | [2008/44] | English: | Foamed membrane | [2008/44] | French: | Membrane moussé | [2008/44] |
Former [2004/23] | Membran und deren Verwendung | ||
Former [2004/23] | Membrane and use thereof | ||
Former [2004/23] | Membrane et son utilisation | Examination procedure | 10.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2008 | 19.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.2009 | BE | 15.04.2009 | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | IE | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | LU | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
IE | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
LU | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
IE | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
BE | 15.04.2009 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | AT | 15.04.2009 | |
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07138401 ; | [A]JP2000042383 ; | [A]JPH07116484 ; | [A]JPH01247435 ; | [A]US5178765 (HU HOPIN [US], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * claim - *; | [A]DE19907824 (UNIV TWENTE FAKULTAET CHEMISCH [NL]) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP1080777 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10,11 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2001021764 (WEISSE HILMAR [DE], et al) [A] 1,10,11 * claims 1-4,17 *; | [AD]DE10033401 (UNIV TWENTE FAKULTAET CHEMISCH [NL]) [AD] 1-15 * example -; claim - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07138401 A 00000000 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,8,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000042383 A 20000215 (TOYOBO CO LTD) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950929), vol. 1995, no. 08, & JP07116484 A 19950509 (TOYO ROSHI KAISHA LTD) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891225), vol. 0135, no. 89, Database accession no. (C - 670), & JP01247435 A 19891003 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1,10,11 * abstract * |