07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
11.07.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
04.07.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
11.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
27.07.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
09.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.06.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.02.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.08.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.07.2005 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
15.06.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
11.05.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
11.05.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
08.04.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2005 |
First examination report |
|
01.02.2005 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.01.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
10.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] |
23.04.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
06.02.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.07.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.06.2003 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.03.2003 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
05.03.2003 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
10.02.2003 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
10.02.2003 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|