EP1426699 - Circulation pumps automatic control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holter, Christian, Dr. Ragnitztalweg 40 8047 Graz / AT | For all designated states Zischka, Walter Buchschachen 129 7411 Markt Allham / AT | For all designated states Lechner, Franz, Ing. Richterweg 20 8062 Kumberg / AT | For all designated states Radovic, Franz Ludersdorf 77 8200 Gleisdorf / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Holter, Christian, Dr. Ragnitztalweg 40 8047 Graz / AT | ||
For all designated states Zischka, Walter Buchschachen 129 7411 Markt Allhau / AT | |||
For all designated states Lechner, Franz, Ing. Richterweg 20 8062 Kumberg / AT | |||
For all designated states Radovic, Franz Ludersdorf 77 8200 Gleisdorf / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/24] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/35] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 32/22 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02026777.9 | 02.12.2002 | [2004/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1426699 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1426699 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/10, F04D15/00 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
F24D19/1012 (EP,US);
F04D15/0066 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/24] | Title | German: | Automatische Regelvorrichtung für Umwälzpumpen | [2004/24] | English: | Circulation pumps automatic control system | [2004/24] | French: | Dispositif de réglage automatique de pompes de circulation | [2004/24] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.08.2007 | CZ | 29.08.2007 | EE | 29.08.2007 | FI | 29.08.2007 | IE | 29.08.2007 | NL | 29.08.2007 | SI | 29.08.2007 | SK | 29.08.2007 | BG | 29.11.2007 | SE | 29.11.2007 | GR | 30.11.2007 | LU | 02.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | PT | 29.01.2008 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 29.08.2007 | |
CZ | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 29.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4312150 (HENNEL EWALD [DE], et al) [A] 6 * column 3, line 37 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [YA]EP0703416 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-3,7 * column 2, line 32 - line 53; figure 1 * [A] 4,6; | [A]DE19600455 (KUDERA OLIVER [DE]) [A] 4 * column 2, line 9 - line 13 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9800764 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0834789 (KSB SA [FR]) [Y] 1-3,7 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 37; figure 1 * |