11.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
07.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] |
10.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
30.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
21.11.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
13.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
09.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] |
11.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
22.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
08.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
01.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2008 [2008/10] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
02.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
27.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.01.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.11.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.09.2006 |
Change - German title |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
28.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.06.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
08.06.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
11.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.03.2005 |
First examination report |
|
11.02.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] |
26.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
21.07.2004 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.05.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] |
14.05.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
28.06.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] |