EP1320184 - Linear electric motor controller and system for providing linear speed control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARTER GROUP, INC. 5108 Fairway Oaks Drive Windermere Florida 34786 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states CARTER GROUP, INC. 5108 Fairway Oaks Drive Windermere, Florida 34786 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ivankovic, Mladen 5170 Lakeshore Rd., Apt. 608 Burlington, Ontario L7L 1C4 / CA | 02 /
Beaumont, Marcus 2164 Orchard Road Burlington, Ontario L7R 3X5 / CA | 03 /
Graterol, Jesus R. 2118 Springdale Road Oakville, Ontario L6M 4C6 / CA | 04 /
LaCroix, Michael Charles 131 Bell Avenue Hamilton, Ontario L8K 3E5 / CA | 05 /
Wang, Hongyu 2012-35 Canyon Avenue Toronto, M3H 4Y2 / CA | [2003/25] | Representative(s) | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S, Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V. / DK | Application number, filing date | 02027255.5 | 06.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | US20010017231 | 13.12.2001 Original published format: US 17231 | US20010017232 | 13.12.2001 Original published format: US 17232 | US20020108707 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: US 108707 | US20020307987 | 03.12.2002 Original published format: US 307987 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1320184 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/00 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
H02P3/00 (EP);
H02P4/00 (EP);
H02P6/08 (EP);
H02P7/03 (EP);
H02P7/29 (EP);
H02H7/0822 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Regelungsvorrichtung für einen elektrischen Linearmotor und System zum Betrieb mit linearer Geschwindigkeitsregelung | [2003/25] | English: | Linear electric motor controller and system for providing linear speed control | [2003/25] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un moteur linéaire électrique et système pour régulation à vitesse linéaire | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.2006 | 31.12.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2007 | 31.12.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2008 | 31.12.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2009 | 31.12.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |