EP1333358 - Computer housing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Domagkstrasse 28 80807 München / DE | [2004/17] |
Former [2003/32] | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Heinrich Pfarrer-Kunders-Strasse 9 33129 Delbrück / DE | [2003/32] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/32] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027401.5 | 09.12.2002 | [2003/32] | Priority number, date | DE2002100054 | 02.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10200054 | [2003/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1333358 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1333358 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/18, G06F1/20 | [2003/32] | CPC: |
G06F1/184 (EP);
G06F1/185 (EP);
G06F1/186 (EP);
G06F1/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2006/33] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Computergehäuse | [2003/32] | English: | Computer housing | [2003/32] | French: | Boîtier d'ordinateur | [2003/32] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SK, TR | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 08.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.03.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5774330 (MELTON ET AL) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 32 - line 53; figures 4,8 *; | [A]DE2622598 (CALABRO,ANTHONY D; CALABRO, ANTHONY DENNIS, UPPER DARBY, PA., US) [A] 1,3 * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 11; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19609887 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INFORMATIONSSYSTEME AG, 33106 PADERBORN, DE) [A] 6,7 * column 4, line 67 - column 6, line 50; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE3539404 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ GMBH & CO KG; ROHDE & SCHWARZ GMBH & CO KG, 8000 MUENC) [A] 2,4,5 * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5929376 (DOUN ET AL) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 13; figures 1-7 *; | [PX]US6403879 (CLEMENTS BRAD E ET AL) [PX] 1-7 * figure -; claim 1 * |