EP1431416 - Protective Ti-Al-Cr-N coating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | For all designated states Sheffield Hallam University The Enterprise Centre City Campus, Howard Street Sheffield S1 1WB / GB | [2004/37] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leyens, Christoph, Dr. Steilweg 16 53639 Königswinter / DE | 02 /
Hovsepian, Papken, Sheffield Hallam University Materials Research Institute, City Campus Howard Street, Sheffield S1 1WB / GB | 03 /
Münz, Wolf-Dieter, Prof.Dr., Sheffield Hallam Univ. Materials Research Institute, City Campus Howard Street, Sheffield S1 1WB / GB | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027457.7 | 10.12.2002 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431416 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C23C28/02, C23C30/00, C23C14/06, C23C14/02 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
C23C14/022 (EP);
C23C14/024 (EP);
C23C14/0641 (EP);
C23C14/0676 (EP);
C23C14/352 (EP);
C23C28/00 (EP);
C23C28/04 (EP);
C23C30/00 (EP);
F05D2300/132 (EP);
F05D2300/133 (EP);
F05D2300/2112 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | Ti-Al-Cr-N Schutzschicht | [2004/26] | English: | Protective Ti-Al-Cr-N coating | [2004/26] | French: | Couche protectrice de Ti-Al-Cr-N | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 26.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH04128363 ; | [XY]US6033768 (MUENZ WOLF-DIETER [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,11,14,15 * claim - * [Y] 7,12,13; | [XY]EP1132498 (METAPLAS IONON GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,11,14 * example 25 * [Y] 7,12,13; | [XY]EP1219723 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,11,14 * figures 1,6,7; examples 1,10,16,19; tables 1,3,11,14,18,19,21 * [Y] 7,12,13; | [XY] - LEWIS D B ET AL, "The influence of the yttrium content on the structure and properties of Ti/sub 1-x-y-z/Al/sub x/Cr/sub y/Y/sub z/N PVD hard coatings", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, 12 MAY 1999, ELSEVIER, SWITZERLAND, vol. 114, no. 2-3, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 187 - 199, XP002243759 [X] 1-4,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003]; table 3 * [Y] 7,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(99)00047-X | [XY] - DONOHUE L A ET AL, "The influence of low concentrations of chromium and yttrium on the oxidation behaviour, residual stress and corrosion performance of TiAlN hard coatings on steel substrates", VACUUM, NOV. 1999, ELSEVIER, UK, vol. 55, no. 2, ISSN 0042-207X, pages 109 - 114, XP002243760 [X] 1-4,11,14 * the whole document * [Y] 7,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0042-207X(99)00135-9 | [XY] - DONOHUE L A ET AL, "MICROSTRUCTURE AND OXIDATION-RESISTANCE OF TI1-X-Y-ZALXCRYYZN LAYERS GROWN BY COMBINED STEERED-ARC/UNBALANCED-MAGNETRON-SPUTTER DEPOSITION", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970421), vol. 94/95, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 226 - 231, XP000826655 [X] 1-4,11,14 * the whole document * [Y] 7,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(97)00249-1 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920821), vol. 016, no. 394, Database accession no. (C - 0976), & JP04128363 A 19920428 (RAIMUZU:KK) [X] 1-4,11,14 * abstract * [Y] 7,12,13 | [Y] - FENG HUANG ET AL, "Microstructure and stress development in magnetron sputtered TiAlCr(N) films", 28TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON METALLURGICAL COATINGS AND THIN FILMS, SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 30 APRIL-4 MAY 2001, Surface & Coatings Technology, Sept.-Oct. 2001, Elsevier, Switzerland, vol. 146-147, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 391 - 397, XP002243761 [Y] 7,12,13 * page 391, paragraph 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(01)01424-4 | Examination | - LEWIS D.B. ET AL, "Structure and stress of TiAlN/CrN uperlattice coatings as a function of CrN layer thickness", SURFACE & COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, SWITZERLAND, (1999), vol. 116-119, pages 284 - 291 |