EP1323809 - Co-current shaft reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smile Beteiligungs GmbH Rheinstrasse 7 41836 Hückelhoven / DE | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states Umweltkontor Renewable Energy AG Brüsseler Strasse 23 41812 Erkelenz / DE | ||
Former [2003/31] | For all designated states OxyTec Energy GmbH Händelstrasse 14 04288 Leipzig / DE | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Umweltkontor Renewable Energy AG Fuggerstrasse 1 04448 Leipzig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Möser Jürgen Karl-Lemnitz-Str.2 06846 Dessau / DE | 02 /
Schulz Manfred Prager Str.199 04299 Leipzig / DE | 03 /
Flick Thomas Leipziger Str.22 09599 Freiberg / DE | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | von Kirschbaum, Alexander, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2003/27] | von Kirschbaum, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027458.5 | 10.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | DE2001220189U | 14.12.2001 Original published format: DE 20120189 U | [2003/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323809 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323809 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323809 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C10J3/26, C10J3/22, F23G5/24 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C10J3/32 (EP);
C10J3/06 (EP);
C10J3/08 (EP);
C10J3/10 (EP);
C10J3/14 (EP);
C10J3/26 (EP);
F23G5/0276 (EP);
F23G5/04 (EP);
F23G5/24 (EP);
F23G5/46 (EP);
F27B1/02 (EP);
F27B1/16 (EP);
F27B1/20 (EP);
F27D1/0003 (EP);
F27D17/001 (EP);
F27D3/0032 (EP);
F27D7/06 (EP);
C10J2200/156 (EP);
C10J2300/0909 (EP);
C10J2300/0943 (EP);
C10J2300/0956 (EP);
C10J2300/0996 (EP);
C10J2300/1246 (EP);
C10J2300/1634 (EP);
C10J2300/1869 (EP);
C10J2300/1884 (EP);
F23G2202/20 (EP);
F23G2205/16 (EP);
F23G2205/18 (EP);
F23G2206/20 (EP);
F23G2209/261 (EP);
F23G2209/28 (EP);
F23G2900/7004 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | C10J3/26, C10J3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/27] | Title | German: | Gleichstrom-Schacht-Reaktor | [2003/27] | English: | Co-current shaft reactor | [2003/27] | French: | Réacteur à lit descendant à co-courant | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 17.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 01.04.2009 | CY | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | EE | 01.04.2009 | FI | 01.04.2009 | IE | 01.04.2009 | IT | 01.04.2009 | NL | 01.04.2009 | TR | 01.04.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | ES | 12.07.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | GB | 10.12.2009 | LU | 10.12.2009 | BE | 31.12.2009 | CH | 31.12.2009 | FR | 31.12.2009 | LI | 31.12.2009 | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/44] | CY | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
IT | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
TR | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
GB | 10.12.2009 | ||
LU | 10.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | DK | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
IT | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
GB | 10.12.2009 | ||
LU | 10.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
IT | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
GB | 10.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | DK | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
GB | 10.12.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | DK | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
BE | 31.12.2009 | ||
CH | 31.12.2009 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
LI | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
NL | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 12.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 12.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4156393 (KUHNERT DIETER [DE], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 9 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [X]US4530702 (FETTERS WAYNE A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,12 * column 13, line 53 - line 56; figure 8 * * column 13, line 68 - column 14, line 20 *; | [X]US4584947 (CHITTICK DONALD E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * column 2, line 4 - line 34; figure 1 *; | [XY]US4813179 (RIBESSE JACQUES [BE]) [X] 1-4,7,8,12 * page 10, line 58 - page 11, line 7; figure 5 * * column 11, line 39 - line 47 * [Y] 5; | [PA]EP1167492 (NACHHALTIGE STOFFNUTZUNG MBH G [DE]) [PA] 1,5* column 9, line 21 - line 55; figure 2 * |