EP1331345 - Safety switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menz, Jürgen Urnenstrasse 26a 51069 Köln / DE | [2003/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/31] | Representative(s) | Nau, Walter Patentanwalt Johann-Pullem-Strasse 8 50999 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/31] | Nau, Walter, Dipl.-Ing. Johann-Pullem-Strasse 8 50999 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027730.7 | 11.12.2002 | [2003/31] | Priority number, date | DE2002102380 | 23.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10202380 | [2003/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1331345 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1331345 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1331345 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00 | [2003/31] | CPC: |
E05F15/431 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/31] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschalteinrichtung | [2003/31] | English: | Safety switching device | [2003/31] | French: | Dispositif de commutation de sécurité | [2003/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.10.2008 | CZ | 22.10.2008 | DK | 22.10.2008 | EE | 22.10.2008 | FI | 22.10.2008 | IE | 22.10.2008 | NL | 22.10.2008 | SI | 22.10.2008 | SK | 22.10.2008 | TR | 22.10.2008 | LU | 11.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 22.01.2009 | GR | 23.01.2009 | PT | 23.03.2009 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 22.10.2008 | |
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
TR | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 11.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 22.10.2008 | |
CZ | 22.10.2008 | ||
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 11.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
LU | 11.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
SK | 22.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CZ | 22.10.2008 | |
DK | 22.10.2008 | ||
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | DK | 22.10.2008 | |
EE | 22.10.2008 | ||
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | DK | 22.10.2008 | |
FI | 22.10.2008 | ||
IE | 22.10.2008 | ||
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 22.10.2008 | |
NL | 22.10.2008 | ||
SI | 22.10.2008 | ||
BG | 22.01.2009 | ||
PT | 23.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/23] | BG | 22.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5826621 ; | [X]JPH07151615 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830506), vol. 007, no. 104, Database accession no. (M - 212), & JP58026621 A 19830217 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [X] 1,3-5,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07151615 A 19950616 (NISSEI DENKI KK) [X] 1-3,9 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3731428 | - F+H-FöRDERN UND HEBEN, (1986), vol. 36, no. 2, page 106 |