EP1324027 - Gas sensing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref., 448-0029 / JP | [2016/21] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-0029 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katafuchi, Toru c/o Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-0029 / JP | 02 /
Mizutani, Keigo c/o Nippon Soken, Inc. 14, Iwaya Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-city, Aichi-pref., 445-0012 / JP | [2016/21] |
Former [2003/27] | 01 /
Katafuchi, Toru c/o Denso Corporation, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-0029 / JP | ||
02 /
Mizutani, Keigo c/o Nippon Soken, Inc., 14, Iwaya, Shimohasumi-cho Nishio-city, Aichi-pref., 445-0012 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/21] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/27] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027771.1 | 11.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010378974 | 12.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001378974 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1324027 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1324027 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | [2004/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1324027 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407, G01N27/417, G01N27/419 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/4071 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | G01N27/407, G01N27/417 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/21] |
Former [2005/02] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gassensorelement | [2003/27] | English: | Gas sensing element | [2003/27] | French: | Elément capteur de gaz | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0987547 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0029] , [0032] , [0034] , [0043] - [0046] * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1006354 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0034] * * figure 1 *; | [X]US6196053 (KATO NOBUHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 9, lines 27-42 * * column 11, line 23 - column 12, line 32 * * column 26, line 1 - column 28, line 15 * * figures 1,2,18A *; | [A]US6205843 (TANAKA AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 19, line 14 - column 20, line 5 * * column 20, lines 58-61 * * column 21, lines 9-11 ** column 25, lines 40-50; figure 10 *; | [X]US2001023823 (TAKAHASHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0050] - [0066] - [0079] - [0082] - [0093] , [0104] - [0107] * * figures 1,10 * |