blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1321431

EP1321431 - The use of aluminium chlorohydrate in deodorants and antiperspirants [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/26]Deodorants and antiperspirants comprising aluminium chlorohydrate
[2006/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2008
Database last updated on 03.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2006/11]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Clariant GmbH
Brüningstrasse 50
65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klug, Peter, Dr.
Am Hohen Stein 22
63762 Grossostheim / DE
02 / Rösch, Norbert, Dr.
Troppauer Strasse 2 a
86386 Gersthofen / DE
03 / Reiser, Karl Werner
Hannoversche Strasse 140 F
30823 Garbsen / DE
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2006/11]
Former [2003/26]Paczkowski, Marcus, Dr., et al
Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1
65843 Sulzbach / DE
Application number, filing date02027901.413.12.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateDE200116324221.12.2001         Original published format: DE 10163242
[2003/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1321431
Date:25.06.2003
Language:DE
[2003/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1321431
Date:19.09.2007
Language:DE
[2007/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2003
ClassificationIPC:C01F7/56, A61Q15/00
[2007/36]
CPC:
A61K8/26 (EP,US); A61Q15/00 (EP,US); C01F7/57 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/26]C01F7/56, A61K7/38
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/27]
Former [2004/12]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Aluminiumchlorohydrat in Deodoranten und Antiperspiranten[2006/44]
English:The use of aluminium chlorohydrate in deodorants and antiperspirants[2006/44]
French:L'utilisation du chlorohydrate d'aluminium dans déodorants et agents anti-transpiration[2006/44]
Former [2003/26]Deodorantien und Antiperspirantien enthaltend Aluminiumchlorohydrat
Former [2003/26]Deodorants and antiperspirants comprising aluminium chlorohydrate
Former [2003/26]Déodorants et agents anti-transpiration comprenant du chlorhydrate d'aluminium
Examination procedure29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
01.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2007Fee for grant paid
05.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.06.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0530598  (SOLVAY WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 7, lines 20-26; example 1 *;
 [X]US5908616  (PAREKH JAWAHAR C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 9, lines 14-17; example 2; claim 11 *;
 [A]WO0071091  (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.