EP1319590 - Scooter type motorcycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2009/23] |
Former [2003/25] | For all designated states YAMAHA HATSUDOKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakamata, Takeo, c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2009/23] |
Former [2003/25] | 01 /
Hakamata, Takeo, c/o Yamaha Hatsudoki K. K. 2500 Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02027959.2 | 13.12.2002 | [2003/25] | Priority number, date | JP20010381851 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001381851 | JP20020042934 | 20.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002042934 | JP20020291982 | 04.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002291982 | [2003/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1319590 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1319590 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62K11/06, B62K11/02 | [2003/25] | CPC: |
F02B61/02 (EP,US);
B62K11/06 (EP,US);
B62K11/10 (EP,US);
B62K2202/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2004/11] |
Former [2003/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Motorroller | [2003/25] | English: | Scooter type motorcycle | [2003/25] | French: | Scooter | [2003/25] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 30.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03186490 ; | [Y]US4660854 (SUZUKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2624084 (GUILET JOEL [FR]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6142253 (MUELLER HELMUT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8,11,12 * column W * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911111), vol. 015, no. 441, Database accession no. (M - 1177), & JP03186490 A 19910814 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [Y] 4,6,11,12 * abstract * |