EP1322063 - Apparatus and method for charges debiting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gabrysch, Mathias, Dr. Ickstattstrasse 2b 80469 München / DE | 02 /
Kasprzyk, Peter Forstenrieder Allee 118 81476 München / DE | [2003/26] | Application number, filing date | 02027975.8 | 13.12.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | DE2001162554 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10162554 | [2003/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1322063 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1322063 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04M17/00, H04M15/00, H04M17/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H04M15/44 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (EP,US);
H04L12/14 (EP,US);
H04L12/1457 (EP,US);
H04L12/1467 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,US);
H04M15/68 (EP,US);
H04M15/8033 (EP,US);
H04M15/90 (EP,US);
H04M17/00 (EP,US);
H04M17/10 (EP,US);
H04W4/24 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0104 (EP,US);
H04M2215/016 (EP,US);
H04M2215/0196 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2026 (EP,US);
H04M2215/22 (EP,US);
H04M2215/32 (EP,US);
H04M2215/7435 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/26] | H04L12/14, H04M15/00, H04M17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2005/11] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Gebührenabbuchung | [2003/26] | English: | Apparatus and method for charges debiting | [2003/26] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour la taxation de débit | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/25] | 12.02.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/25] | Request for further processing for: | 17.08.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 17.08.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.09.2005 | Decision despatched | 27.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0630165 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 45 * * figures 1,2A,2B *; | [Y]WO9528809 (FINLAND TELECOM OY [FI], et al) [Y] 5 * page 1, lines 11-25 * * page 3, lines 1-27 *; | [A]WO9728638 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1,4 * page 11, lines 11-27; figure 1 *; | [A]US5774533 (PATEL NAVNEET A [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 8 - column 7, line 31 * * column 10, line 48 - column 12, line 59 * * column 15, line 48 - column 18, line 19 * * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO0105128 (TELCORDIA TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,7 * page 8, line 20 - page 11, line 5 * * page 12, line 15 - page 15, line 3 *; | [Y]WO0163897 (TELECOMM SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 2 * * page 9, line 28 - page 12, line 19 * * figures 1,2 *; | [PA]WO0208863 (TELEMAC CORP [US]) [PA] 1-4,7 * page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 26 ** page 10, lines 23-30 * |