EP1352912 - Parathyroid hormone analogues for the treatment of osteoporosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA Intellectual Property Services, EG-12, Bldg. M-58, Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states NATIONAL RESEARCH COUNCIL OF CANADA Intellectual Property Services, EG-12, Bldg. M-58, Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbier, Jean-Rene 7 Beloeil Street Gatineau, Québec J8T 7G4 / CA | 02 /
Morley, Paul 777 Southmore Drive West Ottawa, Ontario K1V 6Z9 / CA | 03 /
Neugebauer, Witold 208 Provender Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1K 4N7 / CA | 04 /
Whitfield, James 621 Manfield Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K2A 2T3 / CA | 05 /
Willick, Gordon E. 1950 Kimball Court Orleans, Ontario K1C 7C1 / CA | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02028170.5 | 01.08.1997 | [2003/42] | Priority number, date | US19960691647 | 02.08.1996 Original published format: US 691647 | US19970040560P | 14.03.1997 Original published format: US 40560 P | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352912 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/635, A61K38/29, A61P19/10 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
C07K14/635 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2003/42] | Title | German: | Analoge des Parathormons zur Behandlung der Osteoporose | [2003/42] | English: | Parathyroid hormone analogues for the treatment of osteoporosis | [2003/42] | French: | Analogues de l'hormone parathyroidienne pour le traitement de l'osteoporose | [2003/42] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97933603.9 / EP0915911 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9306845 (PANG PETER K T [CA]) [XD] 1-33 * abstract * * example 1 *; | [X]GB2269176 (SANDOZ LTD [CH]) [X] 1-33 * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO9511988 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al); | [X]CA2126299 (WILLICK GORDON E [CA], et al) [X] 1-33 * the whole document * * figures 1-10; claims 1-3; table 1 *; | [PX]WO9640193 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US]) [PX] 1-33 * the whole document *; | [PX] - BARBIER E A, "Bioactivities and secondary structues of constrained analogues of HUMAN PARATHYROID HORMONE: CYCLIC LACTAMS OF THE RECEPTOR BINDING REGION", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1997), vol. 40, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1373 - 1380, XP002147862 [PX] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960743o | [PX] - WHITFIELD J F ET AL, "CYCLIZATION BY A SPECIFIC LACTAM INCREASES THE ABILITY OF HUMAN PARATHYROID HORMONE (HPTH)-(1-31)NH2 TO STIMULATE BONE GROWTH IN OVARIECTOMIZED RATS", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH, NEW YORK, NY, US, (1997), vol. 12, no. 8, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 1246 - 1252, XP000926228 [PX] 1-33 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/jbmr.1997.12.8.1246 | [X] - T. KANMERA ET AL., "Conformationally constrained PTH-related protein antagonists", PEPTIDES. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 23TH EUROPEAN PEPTIDE SYMPOSIUM, (1994), pages 650 - 651, XP002049214 [X] 1-33 * table 1 * | [X] - NEUGEBAUER W ET AL, "STRUCTURE AND PROTEIN KINASE C STIMULATING ACTIVITIES OF LACTAM ANALOGUES OF HUMAN PARATHYROID HORMONE FRAGMENT", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PEPTIDE AND PROTEIN RESEARCH, (19940601), vol. 43, no. 6, pages 555 - 562, XP000442516 [X] 1-33 * page 558, paragraph 1 * |