EP1336741 - Throttle valve body with limp home device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bender, Günther Mühlweg 25 61191 Rodheim (Rosbach) / DE | [2003/34] | Application number, filing date | 02028354.5 | 17.12.2002 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | DE2002102096 | 21.01.2002 Original published format: DE 10202096 | [2003/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1336741 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1336741 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D11/10, F02D9/10, F02D9/02 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
F02D11/107 (EP);
F02D9/1065 (EP);
F02D2009/0269 (EP);
F02D2009/0277 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drosselklappenstutzen mit Notlaufvorrichtung | [2003/34] | English: | Throttle valve body with limp home device | [2003/34] | French: | Corp de papillon ayant un dispositiv d'emergence | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 22.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4947815 (PETER CORNELIUS [DE]) [A] 1,2* column 2, line 13 - column 2, line 45; figure 1 *; | [A]US5492097 (BYRAM ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 37; figure 4 *; | [A]US5996551 (SCHROEDER THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 31 - column 1, line 48; figures 1,3 *; | [PA]DE10102775 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [PA] 1,2 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 9; figure 1 *; | [PA]DE10102776 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1,2 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 5; figures 1,3 * |