Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50201210D1 | 11.11.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10202096 | 21.01.2002 | DE50201210 | 17.12.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1336741 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2004 | B1 | EP1336741 | 20.08.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10202096 | 21.01.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10202096 | 24.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10202096 | 21.01.2002 |