EP1321754 - Method and equipment for measuring tension of moving web [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper Automation OY Lentokentänkatu 11 33900 Tampere / FI | [2003/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Virtanen, Jorma Ylioppilaankatu 7 B 16 33720 Tampere / FI | [2003/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/26] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028418.8 | 18.12.2002 | [2003/26] | Priority number, date | FI20010002518 | 19.12.2001 Original published format: FI 20012518 | [2003/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1321754 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1321754 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/08, B65H23/02 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
G01L5/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/26] | G01L5/04 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/05] |
Former [2003/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Ausrüstung zur Messung der Spannung einer durchlaufenden Stoffbahn | [2003/26] | English: | Method and equipment for measuring tension of moving web | [2003/26] | French: | Procédé et équipement pour mesurer la tension d'une bande en mouvement | [2003/26] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/33] | 21.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.12.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.12.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.12.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3718037 (WAYE D, et al) [A] 1,10 * column 1, line 31 * * column 3, line 1 * * column 4, lines 21-41 * * column 4, lines 46-49 * * figure 4 *; | [A]US3845434 (CARTER J) [A] 8,17 * column 2, lines 26-28 *; | [A]US4925077 (DAANE ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, lines 1-11 * * column 6, lines 54-56 ** figures 4,11 *; | [X]EP0367901 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [X] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9944058 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-18 * page 3, lines 17-27 *; | [A]WO0050865 (NELES PAPER AUTOMATION OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,6,7 * |