EP1430806 - Device for applying a cosmetic liquid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byun, Young Kwang MokdongSinsigaji Apt. 928-1005, 312, Shinjung-dong, Yangchun-gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Byun, Young Kwang MokdongSinsigaji Apt. 928-1005, 312, Shinjung-dong, Yangchun-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. advotec. Böck, Tappe, Kirschner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Tappe, Hartmut Patentanwälte, Böck + Tappe Kollegen, Kantstrasse 40 97074 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028568.0 | 20.12.2002 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430806 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A46B11/00, B05C17/03, B05C17/035, B65D47/42 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
A45D34/04 (EP);
A46B11/0055 (EP);
B05C17/002 (EP);
A45D2200/056 (EP);
A45D34/041 (EP);
A45D34/042 (EP);
A46B2200/1046 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/11] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gerät zum Auftragen von kosmetischen Flüssigkeiten | [2004/26] | English: | Device for applying a cosmetic liquid | [2004/26] | French: | Distributeur de liquid cosmétique | [2004/26] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/40] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.01.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.01.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3942117 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 20 *; | [Y]EP0922405 (VALOIS SA [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * column 4, line 7 - column 8, line 41 *; | [Y]EP1249187 (BYUN YOUNG KWANG [KR]) [Y] 6-10* column 6, line 48 - column 15, line 55 * |