EP1342410 - Use of a galanin agonist in the preparation of a medicament for improving memory and other cognitive functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/37] | Transgenic animals lacking a functional galanin gene | ||
[2009/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurotargets Limited 3 Frederick Sanger Road Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YG / GB | [2010/13] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Neurotargets Limited Surrey Technology Centre, Occam Road, Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YG / GB | ||
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Neurotargets Limited Surrey Technology Centre, Occam Road, Surrey Research Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 7YG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wynick, David, University of Bristol, Dept.Medicine Bristol Royal Infirmary, Marlborough Street Bristol, BS2 8HW / GB | [2003/37] | Representative(s) | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Dean, John Paul, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 1 Redcliff Street Bristol, BS1 6NP / GB | ||
Former [2007/08] | Turner, Rhiannon Rosalind, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2003/37] | Dean, John Paul Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02028584.7 | 24.07.1997 | [2003/37] | Priority number, date | GB19960015551 | 24.07.1996 Original published format: GB 9615551 | GB19960023869 | 15.11.1996 Original published format: GB 9623869 | [2003/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1342410 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1342410 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1342410 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, A61K38/22, C12N15/00, C12N5/10, G01N33/50, A61P25/28 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
C12N15/8509 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
A61K38/22 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A01K2217/075 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0312 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0318 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0356 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/37] | A01K67/027, C12N5/10, G01N33/50, A61K38/22, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/37] | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Galanin-agonisten in der Herstellung eines Medikaments zur Verbesserung des Gedächtnisses und anderer cognitiver Funktionen | [2009/37] | English: | Use of a galanin agonist in the preparation of a medicament for improving memory and other cognitive functions | [2009/37] | French: | Utilisation d'un agoniste de la galanine dans la préparation d'un médicament pour améliorer la mémoire et d'autres fonctions cognitives | [2009/37] |
Former [2003/37] | Transgenes Tier mit Mangel in einem funktionellem Galanin Gens | ||
Former [2003/37] | Transgenic animals lacking a functional galanin gene | ||
Former [2003/37] | Animaux transgéniques ayant une déficience dans le gène de la galanine | Examination procedure | 10.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97932939.8 / EP0918455 | Opposition(s) | 11.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH06172387 ; | [X]WO9212997 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [X] 11,12 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9215015 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US], et al) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9215681 (GARVAN INST MED RES [AU]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9220709 (ASTRA AB [SE]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [E]WO9726853 (SYNAPTIC PHARMA CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-12* the whole document *; | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 29, Database accession no. 94-238764, XP002045652 & JPH06172387 A 19940621 (AIBAITSU KK) [DA] 1-12 * abstract * | [DA] - BARTFAI T ET AL, "GALANIN AND GALANIN ANTAGONISTS MOLECULAR AND BIOCHEMICAL PERSPECTIVES.", TRENDS PHARMACOL SCI 13 (8). 1992. 312-317, (1992), XP002045935 [DA] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6147(92)90098-Q | [X] - UKAI M ET AL, "Effects of galanin on passive avoidance response, elevated plus-maze learning, and spontaneous alternation performance in mice.", PEPTIDES (TARRYTOWN) 16 (7). 1995. 1283-1286, (1995), XP002045936 [X] 12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0196-9781(95)02009-L | [A] - WYNICK D ET AL, "GALANIN REGULATES BASAL AND OESTROGEN-STIMULATED LACTOTROPH FUNCTION.", NATURE (LOND) 364 (6437). 1993. 529-532, (1993), XP002045651 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/364529a0 | by applicant | WO9212997 | WO9220709 | - KUEHN, M. R. ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 326, pages 295 - 8 | - THOMAS, K. R.; CAPECCHI, M. R., NATURE, (1986), vol. 324, pages 34 - 8 | - EHRICH, E. ET AL., GENE, (1987), vol. 57, pages 229 - 37 | - HOOPER, M. ET AL., NATURE, (1987), vol. 326, pages 292 - 5 | - DANIELSEN, N. ET AL., BRAIN RES., (1995), vol. 681, pages 105 - 108 | - HOOGEVEEN, J.F. ET AL., J. NEUROTOXICOLOGY., (1993), vol. 14, pages 1 - 7 | - DAVIES CH; COLLINGRIDGE GL., J. PHYSIOL. LOND., (1996), vol. 496, pages 451 - 470 | - DAVIES CH ET AL., GABA NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 609 - 611 |