EP1323478 - Vapor-liquid separator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maruyasu Industries Co., Ltd. 7-11, Shiragane 2-chome, Syowa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0058 / JP | [2007/27] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Maruyasu Industries Co., Ltd. 7-11, Shiragane 2-chome, Syowa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-0058 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakakibara, Yasufumi, Maruyasu Industries Co., Ltd. 7-11, Shiragane 2-chome, Syowa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-0058 / JP | 02 /
Kamino, Haruhiko, Maruyasu Industries Co., Ltd. 7-11, Shiragane 2-chome, Syowa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 466-0058 / JP | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028633.2 | 20.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010391043 | 25.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001391043 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323478 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323478 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323478 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B04C3/06, B04C3/04 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
B04C3/06 (EP,US);
B01D45/12 (EP,US);
B04C3/04 (EP,US);
B04C2005/133 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/29] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dampf/Flüssigkeitsabscheider | [2003/27] | English: | Vapor-liquid separator | [2003/27] | French: | Séparateur de liquide/vapeur | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60235661 ; | [X]US3893914 (BOBO ROY A) [X] 1-4,6,8-10 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 63; figures 3-6 *; | [A]EP0874193 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,13-16* abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860422), vol. 0101, no. 07, Database accession no. (C - 341), & JP60235661 A 19851122 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1-4,7-11 * abstract * |