EP1323494 - Rotational indexing device of machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi Nara-ken 639-1183 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken 639-1183 / JP | ||
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Mori Seiki Co., Ltd. 106 Kitakoriyamacho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken 639-1183 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Michio c/o Mori Seiki Co.,Ltd., 106 Kitakoriyama-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken, 639-1183 / JP | [2003/27] | Representative(s) | Kern, Ralf M. advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | Kern, Ralf M., Dipl.-Ing. Hansastrasse 16/II. 80686 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028648.0 | 20.12.2002 | [2003/27] | Priority number, date | JP20010400796 | 28.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001400796 | [2003/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1323494 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1323494 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1323494 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q16/02, B23Q1/40, B23Q16/10 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B23Q1/40 (EP,US);
B23Q1/262 (EP,US);
B23Q1/52 (EP,US);
B23Q16/102 (EP,US);
Y10T29/5165 (EP,US);
Y10T409/309576 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/27] | B23Q16/02, B23Q1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/24] |
Former [2003/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rundschalteinrichtung für Werkzeugmaschine | [2003/27] | English: | Rotational indexing device of machine tool | [2003/27] | French: | Dispositif à indexage circulaire d'une machine-outil | [2003/27] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 03.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.03.2005 | IT | 09.03.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 09.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [ADP]JP2002160144 ; | [A]GB2111873 (DAVIS GAGE AND ENGINEERING COM) [A] 1,3* abstract *; | [A]US6095014 (CHEN YOUNG-DAR [TW], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | [ADP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20021010), vol. 2002, no. 10, & JP2002160144 A 20020604 (MORI SEIKI CO LTD) [ADP] 1,3 * abstract * |