EP1293519 - Brominated polystyrenic resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/12] | Process for brominating polystyrenic resins | ||
[2005/28] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 451 Florida Street Baton Rouge, LA 70801-1765 / US | [2003/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dadgar, Billie B. 240 Leeward Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70808 / US | 02 /
Balhoff, Donald E. 10535 Ridgely Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70809 / US | 03 /
Kolich, Charles H. 11804 Parkbrook Avenue Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 04 /
Lin, Homer C. 2823 Galahad Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 05 /
Ao, Meng-Sheng 5443 Lost Oak Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70817 / US | [2003/12] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02028733.0 | 07.04.1998 | [2003/12] | Priority number, date | US19970852462 | 07.05.1997 Original published format: US 852462 | [2003/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1293519 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1293519 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1293519 | Date: | 21.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/20, C08F12/16 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
C08F8/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F8/20, C08F12/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/12] | Title | German: | Bromierte Polystyrolharze | [2005/28] | English: | Brominated polystyrenic resins | [2005/28] | French: | Résines de polystyrène bromés | [2005/28] |
Former [2003/12] | Verfahren zur Bromierung von Polystyrolharzen | ||
Former [2003/12] | Process for brominating polystyrenic resins | ||
Former [2003/12] | Procédé de bromuration de résines de polystyrène | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 01.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98914612.1 / EP0980394 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE Bromine Compounds Ltd Makleff House Beer-Sheva / IL Opponent's representative Long, Giorgio, et al, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.09.2006
ADMISSIBLE Bromine Compounds Ltd Makleff House Beer-Sheva / IL Opponent's representative Long, Giorgio, et al, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | 26.10.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.03.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.12.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.01.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 11.06.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 11.06.2013 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2013/41] | 31.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 12.03.2010 | Appeal received No. T0538/10 | 25.05.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.10.2012 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2012/43] | 11.06.2013 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 11.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2013 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 21.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4200703 (DIEBEL KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - line 16; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP0110576 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* claims 1-12 *; | [A]EP0201411 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 12 - line 29; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP0277429 (GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 37 - line 40; claims 1-14 *; | [A]WO9113915 (GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-22 * |