EP1325854 - Pneumatic actuator for testing a servo-motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacroix, Stéphane 14, rue de Villé 77220 - Tournan en Brie / FR | 02 /
Maligne, Jean-Charles 20, rue du Goulet 93300 - Aubervilliers / FR | [2003/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/45] |
Former [2003/28] | Hurwic, Aleksander Wiktor Bosch Systemes de Freinage, Service Brevets, 126, rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 02028927.8 | 23.12.2002 | [2003/28] | Priority number, date | FR20010017109 | 31.12.2001 Original published format: FR 0117109 | [2003/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1325854 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1325854 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/58 | [2003/28] | CPC: |
B60T13/52 (EP);
B60T17/221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2003/28] | Title | German: | Pneumatischer Stellantrieb zum Testen eines Servomotors | [2003/28] | English: | Pneumatic actuator for testing a servo-motor | [2003/28] | French: | Verin pneumatique pour le test d'un servomoteur | [2003/28] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/07] | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB485617 (JOHN HENRY ONIONS, et al) [A] 1-12* Jacks; page 5 - page 8 *; | [A]GB533667 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD, et al) [A] 1 * Fluid pressure remote control system; page 6 - page 12 *; | [A]GB689383 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO, et al) [A] 1 * Hydraulic control valve; page 2 - page 3 *; | [A]GB1084957 (SNECMA) [A] 1 * Turbojets; page 2 - page 4 *; | [IY]FR2029119 (MESSIER FA, et al) [I] 1 * Vérin hydraulique; page 3 - page 9 * [Y] 2-12; | [A]US3564849 (HURUTA YOOICHI, et al) [A] 1-12 * Pneumatic booster for brake system; column 5 - column 8 *; | [Y]US3807810 (YARBER G) [Y] 2-12 * Brake control valve system; column 4 - column 6 *; | [I]US4407396 (SIRVEN JACQUES M M [FR]) [I] 1 * Piston-mounted valve biased by gaseous pressure; column 4 - column 10 *; | [A]US6070514 (BAYENS MARK [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * Pneumatic brake booster; column 2 - column 4 * |