EP1229239 - Combined filter and adjuster for a fuel injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2980 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-2980 / US | ||
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states Siemens VDO Automotive Corporation 2400 Executive Hills Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326-2980 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McFarland, Robert 958 Chiswick Circle Newport News, VA 23608 / US | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens Shared Services Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Siemens House, Oldbury Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 8FZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02075284.6 | 23.01.2002 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | US20010773934 | 02.02.2001 Original published format: US 773934 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1229239 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1229239 | Date: | 11.09.2002 | [2002/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1229239 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06, F02M61/16 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
F02M61/205 (EP,US);
F02M51/005 (EP,US);
F02M51/0682 (EP,US);
F02M61/168 (EP,US);
F02M2200/505 (EP,US);
F02M2200/8061 (EP,US);
F02M61/165 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/22] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kombinierte Filter und Einsteller für ein Kraftstoffeinspritzventil | [2002/32] | English: | Combined filter and adjuster for a fuel injector | [2002/32] | French: | Filtre et ajusteur combinés, pour injecteur de combustible | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 29.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 09.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9306359 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-8,11,13 * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 * [A] 14; | [A]US5937887 (BAXTER RANDY C [US], et al) [A] 1-8,11* column 14, line 13 - line 59; figures 1,5A *; | [E]EP1219815 (SIEMENS AUTOMOTIVE CORP LP [US]) [E] 1-8,11-13 * column 6, line 3 - line 24; figure 1 * |