EP1230911 - cosmetic or pharmaceutical preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Gent Natural Products P.O. Box 337 3233 ZG Oostvoorne / NL | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Gent, Louis Houtsniplaan 7 3233 BC Oostvoorne / NL | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2002/33] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 02075586.4 | 12.02.2002 | [2002/33] | Priority number, date | NL20011017333 | 12.02.2001 Original published format: NL 1017333 | [2002/33] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230911 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K7/06, A61K7/025, A61K35/78, A61K35/64 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/10 (EP);
A61K31/355 (EP);
A61K35/644 (EP);
A61K36/28 (EP);
A61K36/886 (EP);
A61K8/46 (EP);
A61K8/678 (EP);
A61K8/922 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61K8/988 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/10, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K35/644, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/19] |
Former [2002/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kosmetisches oder pharmazeutisches Mittel | [2002/33] | English: | cosmetic or pharmaceutical preparation | [2002/33] | French: | Préparation cosmétique ou pharmaceutique | [2002/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/50] | 03.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.03.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.03.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.03.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2633515 (CLARINS [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9725970 (LANCASTER GROUP GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19708478 (STRATHAUSEN GEROLD [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0001351 (TRANSDERMAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * claims 1,7,19 *; | [A]DE19904801 (KLOSSNER AXEL [DE]) [A] 1-6* the whole document * |