EP1234860 - Metal complex for ink jet ink [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erdtmann, David, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Lopez, Edgardo, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Van Hanehem, Richard C., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Evans, Steven, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/35] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patent Department (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02075634.2 | 15.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | US20010794608 | 27.02.2001 Original published format: US 794608 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1234860 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1234860 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
C09B45/16 (EP);
C09B45/18 (EP);
C09B45/20 (EP);
C09B45/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/21] |
Former [2002/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Metallkomplex für Tintenstrahldrucktinten | [2002/35] | English: | Metal complex for ink jet ink | [2002/35] | French: | Complexe métallique pour encre d'impression par jet | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 30.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5997622 (WEBER HELMUT [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-12 *; | [AD]US6011161 (KAMESWARAN VENKATARAMAN [US]); | [A]EP0997504 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [D]US6059868 (KASPERCHIK VLADEK [US]) |