EP1235432 - Receiver for multi-operator encrypted signals with reduced congestion and lower costs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entropic Communications, Inc. 6290 Sequence Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2010/49] | For all designated states Trident Microsystems (Far East) Ltd. Ugland House South Church Street Grand Cayman / KY | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benoit, Hervé Société Civile S.P.I.D., 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Volker Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Fischer, Volker Epping Hermann Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/49] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/34] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/47] | Roche, Denis, et al Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/49] | van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/35] | Chaffraix, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02075673.0 | 19.02.2002 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | FR20010002664 | 27.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102664 | [2002/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1235432 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
H04N21/4181 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,KR,US);
H04H60/15 (EP,US);
H04H60/23 (EP,US);
H04N21/8193 (EP,US);
H04N7/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Title | German: | Empfänger für verschlüsselte Signale von mehreren Betreibern mit veringerter Überlastung und reduzierten Kosten | [2002/35] | English: | Receiver for multi-operator encrypted signals with reduced congestion and lower costs | [2002/35] | French: | Système de réception de signaux cryptés multi-opérateurs à encombrement et coût réduits | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 26.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2012 | 28.02.2013 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - ENGELKAMP H, "HARD- UND SOFTWARE DER SET-TOP-BOXEN", RADIO FERNSEHEN ELEKTRONIK, VEB VERLAG TECHNIK. BERLIN, DE, (19960801), vol. 45, no. 8, ISSN 1436-1574, pages 20 - 23, XP000623888 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - "FUNCTIONAL MODEL OF A CONDITIONAL ACCESS SYSTEM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19951221), no. 266, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 64 - 77, XP000559450 [X] 1-10 * page 65, column L, line 1 - column R, line 67 * * page 67, column R, line 25 - page 70, column R, line 9 * * page 71, column L, line 1 - column R, line 9 * * page 73, column L, line 17 - line 30 * * figures 1-8 * | [A] - FUTRO A T, "SMART CARD FOR CONDITIONAL ACCESS: A MARKETING AND SECURITY TOOL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL TELEVISION SYMPOSIUM AND TECHNICAL EXHIBITION. MONTREUX, JUNE 10 - 15, 1993. CABLE TV SESSIONS, GENEVE, CCITT, CH, (19930611), vol. SYMP. 18, pages 733 - 742, XP000379321 [A] 1-10 * page 736, line 6 - line 30 * * page 738, line 5 - page 739, line 18 * |