EP1349305 - Method for transmission of information between two unitseach having means for transmission and/or reception of signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2003/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guanter, Jean-Charles Chenaux 133 2517 Diesse / CH | 02 /
Bernasconi, Ermanno Chaussée de la Boine 22 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
Xu, Ming Rue des Fahys 13 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Laurent, Jean, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Laurent, Jean, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 02076153.2 | 25.03.2002 | [2003/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1349305 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04B1/38 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
G04G21/04 (EP);
H04L7/08 (EP);
H04B1/385 (EP);
H04L1/1607 (EP);
H04L2007/045 (EP);
H04L7/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/26] |
Former [2003/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur informationsübertragung zwischen zwei Geräten mit Mittel zur Empfang und/oder Senden | [2003/40] | English: | Method for transmission of information between two unitseach having means for transmission and/or reception of signals | [2003/40] | French: | Procédé de transmission d'information entre deux unités munies chacune de moyens d'émission et/ou de réception de signaux | [2003/40] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 29.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 12.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.05.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5801664 (SEIDENSTICKER ROBERT B [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 12; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5943376 (PROCTOR LEE MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column A; figure 6 *; | [AD]EP0957589 (ASULAB SA [CH]) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US2001038650 (PARK DONG-SEEK [KR], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0016]; figures 3A,3B * |