EP1260621 - Device for separating warp yarns on a face-to-face weaving machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NV Michel van de Wiele Michel Vandewielestraat 7/17 8510 Kortrijk/Marke / BE | [2005/44] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states NV Michel van de Wiele Michel Vandewielestraat 7/17 8510 Kortrijk/Marke / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debaes, Johny Diepestraat 5 8890 Moorslede / BE | 02 /
Maes, Dominique Baliekouter 34 8720 Wakken / BE | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Ostyn, Frans, et al KOB NV President Kennedypark 31 c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Ostyn, Frans, et al K.O.B. NV Kennedypark 31 c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 02076298.5 | 02.04.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | BE20010000266 | 20.04.2001 Original published format: BE 200100266 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260621 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260621 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D03D39/16 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
D03D39/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT, TR [2003/33] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Trennung der Kettfäden in einer Doppelstück-Webmaschine | [2002/48] | English: | Device for separating warp yarns on a face-to-face weaving machine | [2002/48] | French: | Dispositif pour séparer les fils de chaîne dans un métier double pièce | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 20.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/38] | IT | 02.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0671494 (WIELE MICHEL VAN DE NV [BE]) [A] 1-13* column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,3 * |