EP1250866 - Guide means to be fitted between two leg members of a telescopic leg [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | 23.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Assenburg B.V. Zevenheuvelenweg 15 NL-5048 AN Tilburg / NL | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van de Wouw, Erik Adrianus Josephus Strausslaan 120 5011 KJ Tilburg / NL | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Dorna, Peter, et al Algemeen Octrooibureau Postbus 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02076328.0 | 05.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | NL20011017876 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: NL 1017876 | [2002/43] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1250866 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47B9/20 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
A47B9/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/43] | Title | German: | Führungsmittel zur Montage zwischen zwei Bauteilen eines teleskopischen Beines | [2002/43] | English: | Guide means to be fitted between two leg members of a telescopic leg | [2002/43] | French: | Moyens de guidage destiné á être adapté entre deux membres de pied d'un pied télescopique | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/21] | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE29812762U (PHOENIX MECANO KOMPONENTEN AG [CH]) [DA] 1-13 * figure - *; | [A]DE7408117U (REINHARD HÖRNLEIN KG) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0681891 (OTTO KIND AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE3340087 (KONRAD MERKT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | DE29812762U |