EP1235150 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING SERVLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/35] | Apparatus and method for processing servlets | ||
[2016/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle America, Inc. 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2011/10] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 4150 Network Circle Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Sun Microsystems, Inc. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, California 94043-1110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gosling, James A. P.O. Box 620509 Woodside, California 94062 / US | 02 /
Diwanji, Pavani 1436 Rosecraft Terrace San Jose, California 95126 / US | 03 /
Connelly, David W. 229 Del Monte Avenue Los Altos, California 94022 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/17] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2002/35] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076417.1 | 27.05.1997 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | US19960657712 | 30.05.1996 Original published format: US 657712 | US19960756325 | 25.11.1996 Original published format: US 756325 | US19970828318 | 28.03.1997 Original published format: US 828318 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1235150 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1235150 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1235150 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
G06F9/4843 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
G06F9/445 (EP,US);
G06F9/465 (EP,US);
G06F9/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2017/14] |
Former [2002/35] | DE, FR, GB, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SERVLET-VERARBEITUNG | [2016/46] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING SERVLETS | [2016/46] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE "SERVLETS" | [2016/46] |
Former [2002/35] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Servlet-verarbeitung | ||
Former [2002/35] | Apparatus and method for processing servlets | ||
Former [2002/35] | Dispositif et procédé de traitement de "servlets" | Examination procedure | 13.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97303576.9 / EP0810524 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19970303576) is 31.08.2001 | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 05.04.2017 | GB | 26.05.2017 | [2018/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP0735469 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [PX] 1,7,12,19 * the whole document *; | [PX] - LOWE J, "HOW JAVA SERVLETS CAN REPLACE CGI SCRIPTS - FOR EASE, PERFORMANCE & MORE. WE LOOK AT THREE APPROACHES TO PLUG-IN SERVER-SIDE JAVA EXECUTION", NETSCAPEWORLD, XX, XX, (19970505), pages 1 - 3, XP002041555 [PX] 1,7,12,19 * the whole document * | [PX] - GORMAN T, "SERVER-SIDE APPLETS IN JAVA GENERATE DEVELOPER ANTICIPATION", NETSCAPEWORLD, XX, XX, (199607), pages 1 - 4, XP002041556 [PX] 1,7,12,19 * the whole document * | [A] - PADMANABHAN V N, "IMPROVING WORLD WIDE WEB LATENCY", UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA REPORT, XX, XX, (199505), pages 1 - 24, XP002041557 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | [A] - BROWN M R, "FASTCGI: A HIGH-PERFORMANCE GATEWAY INTERFACE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON WORLD WIDE WEB, XX, XX, (19960502), pages 1 - 3, XP002041558 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * | [A] - "CONTROL OF DYNAMIC THREADS POOL FOR CONCURRENT REMOTE PROCEDURE CALLS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19950501), vol. 38, no. 5, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 199 - 200, XP000519546 [A] 1,7,12,19 * the whole document * | [A] - ORFALI R ET AL, "CLIENT/SERVER WITH DISTRIBUTED OBJECTS", BYTE, MCGRAW-HILL INC. ST PETERBOROUGH, US, (19950401), vol. 20, no. 4, ISSN 0360-5280, pages 151 - 152,154,15, XP000501827 [A] 1,7,12,19 * the whole document * | by applicant | - MARK BROWN, "FastCGI: A High Performance Gateway Interface", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON THE WORLDWIDEWEB, (199605), pages 1 - 3, XP002041558 |