EP1255409 - Conversion between textual and binary BIFS (Binary Format for scene) format [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duquesnois, Laurent, Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2004/36] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2002/45] | de la Fouchardière, Marie-Noelle Société Civile "SPID" 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02076505.3 | 17.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | FR20010005503 | 24.04.2001 Original published format: FR 0105503 | [2002/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255409 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26, H04N7/24 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
H04N21/234318 (EP,US);
H04N5/262 (KR);
H04N19/25 (EP,US);
H04N21/80 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Title | German: | Konvertierung zwischen textuellem und binärem BIFS Format | [2002/45] | English: | Conversion between textual and binary BIFS (Binary Format for scene) format | [2002/45] | French: | Conversion d'un format BIFS textuel vers un format BIFS binaire | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 01.08.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SIGNES J, "BINARY FORMAT FOR SCENE (BIFS): COMBINING MPEG-4 MEDIA TO BUILD RICH MULTIMEDIA SERVICES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (19990125), vol. 3653, pages 1506 - 1517, XP000984179 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.334661 | [A] - ELEFTHERIADIS A, "MPEG-4 systems: architecting object-based audio-visual content", IEEE WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING. PROCEEDINGS OF SIGNAL PROCESSING SOCIETY WORKSHOP ON MULTIMEDIA SIGNAL PROCESSING, XX, XX, (19981207), pages 535 - 540, XP002160812 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [AD] - "Coding of Moving Pictures and Audio", 3G TS 25.323 V3.1.0, XX, XX, XX, (19991101), pages 1 - 6, XP002184603 [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * | [A] - "STUDY OF ISO/IEC 14496-1:2001/PDAM2", ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG11 N3866, XX, XX, XX, (20010101), pages 01 - 157, XP000997692 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | [AD] - ELEFTHERIADIS A ET AL, "WORKING DRAFT 5.0 OF ISO/IEC 14496-1", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 N1825, XX, XX, (19970725), pages 1 - 215, XP000982956 [AD] 1-6 * page 24, paragraph 1.7 * * page 27, paragraph 1.13 - page 47, paragraph 2.7 * |