EP1256765 - Anchorage for side plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigarth AB Box 45 330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nilsson, Kenneth Hjortronstigen 9 330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | Application number, filing date | 02076703.4 | 30.04.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | SE20010001627 | 09.05.2001 Original published format: SE 0101627 | [2002/46] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256765 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256765 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256765 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/06 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F24D19/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [2004/31] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Befestigung für Seitenplatten | [2002/46] | English: | Anchorage for side plate | [2002/46] | French: | Fixation pour plaques latérales | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 28.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | IT | 14.07.2010 | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4408242 (ULAMO BEHEER BV [NL]) [A] 1* abstract * |