EP1254991 - Assembly of a gutter and a grate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T.B.S. Soest B.V. Koningsweg 30 3762 EC Soest / NL | [2007/13] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states TBS Soest b.v. Koningsweg 30 NL-3762 EC Soest / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ent, Wouter Waalwijk 71 4171 CB Herwijnen / NL | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 02076735.6 | 01.05.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | NL20011017976 | 01.05.2001 Original published format: NL 1017976 | [2002/45] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254991 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1254991 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254991 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E03F5/06 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
E03F5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Title | German: | Ablaufrinne und Rostanordnung | [2002/45] | English: | Assembly of a gutter and a grate | [2002/45] | French: | Ensemble canal d'écoulement et grille | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 11.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.03.2007 | CH | 28.03.2007 | CY | 28.03.2007 | DK | 28.03.2007 | FI | 28.03.2007 | IT | 28.03.2007 | LI | 28.03.2007 | TR | 28.03.2007 | IE | 01.05.2007 | LU | 01.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | SE | 28.06.2007 | GR | 29.06.2007 | ES | 09.07.2007 | PT | 28.08.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IT | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 01.05.2007 | ||
LU | 01.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
CY | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IT | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 01.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IT | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
IE | 01.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
GR | 29.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
DK | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
CH | 28.03.2007 | ||
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
LI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
PT | 28.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 28.03.2007 | |
FI | 28.03.2007 | ||
SE | 28.06.2007 | ||
ES | 09.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 28.03.2007 | |
SE | 28.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4787773 (KEHLER GLEN M [CA]) [A] 8* figure 5 *; | [XYA]CH677243 (VON ROLL AG) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 51; figure - * [Y] 5,6,8,11-13 [A] 4; | [XA]CH685782 (REIS BRUECKENELEMENTE AG) [X] 1,2,5,7 * the whole document * [A] 11-13; | [XA]EP0694654 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,10 * column 2, paragraph L - column 5, line 54; figure - * [A] 11-13; | [Y]WO9635020 (AHLMANN ACO SEVERIN [DE], et al) [Y] 5,6,11-13 * page 5, line 13 - line 29; figure - *; | [XA]EP0811732 (PREFAEST SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,10 * column 3, paragraph L - column 6, line 47; figure - * [A] 3,4,11-13; | [Y]US6220784 (BRICKER ALBERT W [US]) [Y] 8 * figure - * |