EP1259086 - Network of radio mobile telecommunications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellon France SAS Route d'Angers 72100 Le Mans / FR | [2003/13] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coutant, Francois, c/o Int.Octrooibureau B.V. Prof.Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Kohn, Philippe, et al Cabinet Philippe Kohn 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Kohn, Philippe, et al Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | ||
Former [2002/50] | Kohn, Philippe, et al Cabinet Philippe Kohn, 30, rue Hoche 93500 Pantin / FR | ||
Former [2002/47] | Chaffraix, Jean Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02076784.4 | 06.05.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | FR20010006393 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: FR 0106393 | [2002/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1259086 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/32, H04Q7/38 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
H04W36/36 (EP,US);
H04W36/10 (EP,US);
H04W36/16 (EP,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2003/33] |
Former [2003/32] | AT, BE | ||
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mobilfunkkommunikationsnetzwerk | [2002/47] | English: | Network of radio mobile telecommunications | [2002/47] | French: | Reseau de telecommunications radiomobile | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/22] | 05.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0294829 ; | [A]JPH1141665 ; | [A]WO9843455 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]); | [Y]US5913167 (BONTA JEFFREY D [US], et al); | [A]WO0027158 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]US6175733 (SEEKINS DAVID S [US], et al); | [A]US6178327 (GOMEZ SUSAN LORRAINE [US]); |