EP1361750 - Video and text display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02076814.9 | 08.05.2002 | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361750 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N5/44, H04N7/01 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
H04N7/012 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (EP,US);
H04N21/44004 (EP,US);
H04N21/4402 (EP,US);
H04N5/44504 (EP,US);
H04N21/4888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Video- und Textanzeige | [2003/46] | English: | Video and text display | [2003/46] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage de vidéo et de texte | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2004/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4518984 (MITSCHKE HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * column 1, lines 18-41 *; | [A]EP0422729 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 56 - column 12, line 38 *; | [A]EP0610701 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract ** page 2, lines 17-55 *; | [A]US5963262 (KE LIGANG [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US6281933 (RITTER DAVID W [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 58 * |