EP1243750 - Carboxyalkyl substituted polygalactomannan fracturing fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHODIA INC. Prospect Plains Road Cranbury, New Jersey 08512 / US | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moorhouse, Ralph 312 Bless Circle Richboro, Pennsylvania 18954 / US | 02 /
Cottrell, Ian William 2206 Yardley Road Yardley, Pennsylvania 19067 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington & Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2002/39] | Hall, Marina Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02076822.2 | 22.04.1996 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | US19950428263 | 25.04.1995 Original published format: US 428263 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243750 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243750 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E21B43/26, C08L5/14 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C08L5/14 (EP,US);
C08B37/0096 (EP,US);
C09K8/685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/39] | Title | German: | Carboxyalkyl substituierte Polygalaktomannan enthaltende Fracturing-Flüssigkeiten | [2002/39] | English: | Carboxyalkyl substituted polygalactomannan fracturing fluids | [2002/39] | French: | Fluides de fracturation constitués de polygalactommannane substitué par un groupe carboxyalkyle | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 31.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96913054.1 / EP0824632 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3740389 (NORDGREN R) [A] * column 3, line 48 - line 50 *; | [XY]US4324668 (HARRIS LAWRENCE E) [X] 1,4,5,8,9,20 * column 3, line 21 * * column 4, line 24 - line 25 * * column 8; claims 1,3 * [Y] 2,3,6,7,10-19,21-29; | [A]US4514309 (WADHWA SURESH K [US]) [A] 6,7,22,25,30 * column 3, line 27 - line 36 *; | [YA]US5165479 (HARRIS PHILLIP C [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,22,25 * column 3, line 27 - line 36 * [A] 30; | [DY]US5305832 (GUPTA D V SATYANARAYANA [US], et al) [DY] 2,3,10-19,21,23,24,26-29 * column 2, line 3 - line 6; claims 1,6,7 * * column 3, line 25 - line 35 * * column 3, line 51 - line 53 * |