EP1285588 - Fibre containing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2006/40] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2003/09] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frith, William James Unilever R&D Colworth Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 02 /
Norton, Ian Timothy Unilever R&D Colworth Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | 03 /
Wolf, Bettina Unilever R&D Colworth Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Joppe, Hermina Laura Petronella, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [2009/50] |
Former [2006/04] | Joppe, Hermina Laura Petronella, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2006/03] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al Unilever Patent Department Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [2003/09] | Van Velzen, Maaike Mathilde, et al Unilever N.V. Patent Department Postbus 137 3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 02077857.7 | 16.07.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | EP20010306859 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: EP 01306859 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1285588 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285588 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/05, A23D7/00 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
A23G3/48 (EP);
A23C20/00 (EP);
A23D7/0056 (EP);
A23D7/015 (EP);
A23G3/346 (EP);
A23G3/42 (EP);
A23G9/34 (EP);
A23G9/42 (EP);
A23G9/52 (EP);
A23L29/238 (EP);
A23L29/256 (EP);
A23L29/262 (EP);
A23L29/272 (EP);
A23L29/284 (EP);
A23G2200/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/06 (EP);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/14 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/50364, A23V2250/51082 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/5054, A23V2250/5026 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/09] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung enthaltend Diätfasern | [2003/09] | English: | Fibre containing composition | [2003/09] | French: | Composition contenant des fibres | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 28.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.11.2007 | BE | 28.11.2007 | CH | 28.11.2007 | CY | 28.11.2007 | CZ | 28.11.2007 | DK | 28.11.2007 | EE | 28.11.2007 | FI | 28.11.2007 | LI | 28.11.2007 | NL | 28.11.2007 | SK | 28.11.2007 | TR | 28.11.2007 | BG | 28.02.2008 | SE | 28.02.2008 | GR | 29.02.2008 | ES | 11.03.2008 | PT | 28.04.2008 | IE | 16.07.2008 | LU | 16.07.2008 | IT | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
TR | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LU | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
LU | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
IE | 16.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CY | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
BE | 28.11.2007 | ||
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 28.11.2007 | |
CH | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 28.11.2007 | |
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 28.11.2007 | |
LI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SE | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0574973 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 2, line 48 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 11; example -; claims 1-8 *; | [X]US6136363 (BIALEK JADWIGA MALGORZATA [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 44 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 6; example 4; claim - *; | [X]US5952007 (BAKKER MARINUS ADRIAAN [NL], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 59; claims 1,2,5-7 *; | [L] - WOLF H ET AL, "INFLUENCE OF GELATION ON PARTICLE SHAPE IN SHEARED BIOPOLYMER BLENDS", JOURNAL OF RHEOLOGY, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, EASTON, PA, US, (200109), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 0097-0360, pages 1141 - 1157, XP001038774 [L] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1141, paragraph 1 - page 1142, paragraph 2 * * page 1144, paragraph 2 - page 1146, paragraph 3; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1122/1.1389312 |