EP1280034 - Device for adjusting the position of a pedal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ergom Holding S.p.a. Via Stura, 1/3 10071 Borgaro Torinese (Torino) / IT | [2003/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cimminelli, Francesco Via Cibrario 10 10143 Torino / IT | 02 /
Specchio, Michele Via Don Minzoni 18 10092 Beinasco, Frazione Borgaretto (TO) / IT | 03 /
Giaccaria, Flavio Via Bellini 32 10093 Collegno (TO) / IT | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Cian, Paolo, et al Saconney & Cian S.r.l Corso Vittorio Emanuelle II 14 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Cian, Paolo, et al Saconney & Cian S.r.l Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 14 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02077862.7 | 15.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00754 | 27.07.2001 Original published format: IT TO20010754 | [2003/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1280034 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1280034 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G05G1/14 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G05G1/405 (EP);
B60T7/06 (EP);
B60K23/00 (EP);
B60K26/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/42] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einstellvorrichtung zum Verstellen der Lage eines Pedals | [2003/05] | English: | Device for adjusting the position of a pedal | [2003/05] | French: | Dispositif pour ajuster la position d'une pédale | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 30.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SK, TR | 09.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 22.12.2004 | [2005/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0363546 (WICKES MFG CO [US]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 38 ** figures 1-3 *; | [DA]EP0936527 (DELPHI TECH INC [US]) [DA] 1,2,5,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] * * figures 1-3 *; | [PXA]US2001013262 (SCHAMBRE JOHN [US], et al) [PX] 1-5,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * figures 2-6 * [A] 7 |