EP1289207 - A method of deriving a route through a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROKE MANOR RESEARCH LIMITED Old Salisbury Lane Romsey Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Roke Manor Research Limited Old Salisbury Lane Romsey, Hampshire SO51 0ZN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwin, Richard 97 Stanton Road Southampton, SO15 4HU / GB | 02 /
Reeve, Andrew 47 Western Road Winchester, Hampshire SO22 5AH / GB | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Payne, Janice Julia, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02077961.7 | 19.07.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | GB20010021135 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: GB 0121135 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1289207 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1289207 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
H04L47/822 (EP,US);
H04L45/10 (EP,US);
H04L45/38 (EP,US);
H04L45/62 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (EP,US);
H04L47/781 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/31] |
Former [2003/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren des Ableitens eines Weges durch ein Netz | [2003/10] | English: | A method of deriving a route through a network | [2003/10] | French: | Une méthode de dériver un itinéraire à travers un réseau | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.06.2007 | 30.05.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.06.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5042027 (TAKASE AKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 29 * * column 5, line 14 - column 7, line 56 * * column 8, line 50 - column 9, line 47 *; | [A]US5179556 (TURNER JONATHAN S [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 13 - line 24 ** column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 63 *; | [X]EP1035751 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 32 - line 47 * * page 5, line 16 - page 7, line 58 * * page 8, line 41 - page 9, line 39 * * page 12, line 55 - page 15, line 20 * |