EP1261000 - Electric citrcuit protection device having electrical parts ultrasonically joined using a brazing alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy & Automation, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005-4437 / US | [2002/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newland, Charles Allen 105 S. Koke Street DeGraff, OH 43318 / US | [2003/46] |
Former [2002/48] | 01 /
Newland, Charles Allen 105 S. Koke Street De Graff, OH 43318 / US | Representative(s) | French, Clive Harry, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | French, Clive Harry, et al Siemens AG, PO Box 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02078046.6 | 21.09.1998 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | US19970941337 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: US 941337 | US19970941334 | 30.09.1997 Original published format: US 941334 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261000 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1261000 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01H11/04 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H01H1/0231 (EP);
H01H11/042 (EP);
H01H1/5822 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/48] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schaltungsschutzeinrichtung mit Ultraschall geschweissten elektrische Teilen unter benützung von einer Hartlötlegierung | [2002/48] | English: | Electric citrcuit protection device having electrical parts ultrasonically joined using a brazing alloy | [2002/48] | French: | Dispositif de protection de circuits électriques comportant des parties électriques jointes par ultrasons au moyen d'un alliage de brasage | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 21.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98947169.3 / EP1019930 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 25.07.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2003 | 25.07.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2003 | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4019876 (STOCKEL DIETER, et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, lines 10-14 *; | [Y]US2694126 (BINSTOCK MARTIN H) [Y] 1 * column W *; | [A]WO9311550 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4740770 (LAZARETH MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] * column 3, lines 38-45 * |