EP1295869 - Compounds and method for preparing substituted 4-phenyl-4-cyanocyclohexanoic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states SmithKline Beecham Corporation One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Smithkline Beecham One Franklin Plaza Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Andrew 121 Neyland Court Exton, PA 19341 / US | 02 /
Diederich, Anne Marie 106 Kaiser Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | 03 /
Liu, Li 153 Hunsicker Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 04 /
Mendelson, Wilford 592 General Learned Road Kind of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2003/13] | Representative(s) | Rutter, Keith, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Rutter, Keith, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078056.5 | 12.02.1998 | [2003/13] | Priority number, date | US19970037608P | 12.02.1997 Original published format: US 37608 P | [2003/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1295869 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1295869 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1295869 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07C253/30, C07C255/46 | [2003/13] | CPC: |
C07C253/30 (EP);
C07D303/48 (EP);
C07C2601/08 (EP);
C07C2601/14 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C253/30, C07C255/46 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/13] | Extension states | RO | 26.07.2002 | SI | 26.07.2002 | Title | German: | Verbindungen und Verfahren zur Herstellung substituierter 4-Phenyl-4-Cyanocyclohexansäuren | [2003/13] | English: | Compounds and method for preparing substituted 4-phenyl-4-cyanocyclohexanoic acids | [2003/13] | French: | Composés et procédé de préparation d'acides 4-phényl-4-cyanocyclohéxanoiques substitués | [2003/13] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 29.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98908534.5 / EP1023279 | Divisional application(s) | EP04078092.6 / EP1524268 | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5552438 (CHRISTENSEN IV SIEGFRIED B) [DA] 1-28 * column 13, line 45 - column 16, line 9; claims 1-30 * * column 16, line 1 - column 16, line 4 * [A] 29-32; | [A]US5602173 (CHRISTENSEN IV SIEGFRIED B) [A] 1-28,29-32 * column 12, line 32 - column 14, line 15; examples 1-8 * * column 13, line 53 - column 13, line 62 *; | [A]US5602157 (CHRISTENSEN IV SIEGFRIED B) [A] 1-28,29-32 * column 13, line 54 - column 16, line 16; examples 1-30 * * column 16, line 7 - column 16, line 11 *; | [T] - CHRISTENSEN S B ET AL, "1,4-Cyclohexanecarboxylates: Potent and Selective Inhibitors of Phosphodiesterase 4 for the Treatment of Asthma", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 821 - 835, XP002173934 [T] 1-28 * scheme 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm970090r |