EP1258530 - Gaba-A receptor subunits (alpha-2, alpha-3, alpha-5, alpha -6, beta-2) and transfected cells expressing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handingham, Karen Louise Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 02 /
Le Bourdelles, Beatrice Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 03 /
Whiting, Paul John Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 04 /
Wingrove, Peter Baxter Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2002/47] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02078136.5 | 09.06.1992 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | GB19910012504 | 11.06.1991 Original published format: GB 9112504 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258530 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1258530 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C07K14/705, G01N33/566 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
C07K14/70571 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2002/47] | Title | German: | Gaba-a Rezeptoruntereinheiten (alpha-2, alpha-3, alpha-5, alpha-6, beta-2) und transfektierte Zellen, die diese expremieren | [2002/47] | English: | Gaba-A receptor subunits (alpha-2, alpha-3, alpha-5, alpha -6, beta-2) and transfected cells expressing them | [2002/47] | French: | Sous-unités (alpha-2, alpha-3, alpha-5, alpha-6, beta-2) de récepteur de gaba-a et cellules transfectées les exprimant | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/42] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92911528.5 / EP0589930 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - YMER S ET AL, "GABAA RECEPTOR BETA SUBUNIT HETEROGENEITY: FUNCTIONAL EXPRESSION OF CLONED CDNAS", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1989), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 1665 - 1670, XP000674574 [X] 9-11 * The whole document especially figure 2 the bovine and rat GABA A receptor beta 2 subunit sequences * | [XY] - SCHOFIELD P R ET AL, "SEQUENCE AND EXPRESSION OF HUMAN GABAA RECEPTOR ALPHA 1 AND BETA1 SUBUNITS", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19890227), vol. 244, no. 2, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 361 - 364, XP000653686 [X] 10,11 * page 364 * [Y] 1-3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(89)80563-0 | [Y] - YMER S ET AL, "STRUCTURAL AND FUNCTIONAL CHARACTERIZATION OF THE GAMMA-1 SUBUNIT OF GABA-A BENZODIAZEPINE RECEPTORS", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, (1990), vol. 9, no. 10, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 3261 - 3267, XP002213588 [Y] 1-3 * the whole document * | [X] - SCHOFIELD P R ET AL, "SEQUENCE AND FUNCTIONAL EXPRESSION OF THE GABAA RECEPTOR SHOWS A LIGAND-GATED RECEPTOR SUPER-FAMILY", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19870716), vol. 328, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 221 - 227, XP000197555 [X] 10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/328221a0 | [PX] - HADINGHAM K L ET AL, "STABLE EXPRESSION OF MAMMALIAN TYPE A GAMMA AMINOBUTYRIC ACID RECEPTORS IN MOUSE CELLS DEMONSTRATION OF FUNCTIONAL ASSEMBLY OF BENZODIAZEPINE-RESPONSIVE SITES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1992, (1992), vol. 89, no. 14, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6378 - 6382, XP002213589 [PX] 1-11,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.14.6378 |